Barker v. Palmer

Petitioner: Curtis Barker
Respondent: Warden Palmer and Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2011cv00440
Filed: March 24, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Motion for a Copy of Petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: copy of Petition & docket sheet to Petitioner - MMM)
January 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. The clerk of Court shall Enter Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 15, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is GRANTED. Petitioners motion for the appointment of counsel 2 is DENIED. Clerk to file Petition. Respondents shall have 45 days from entry of this order within which to answer or respond to petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.