Brown-Younger v. State Of Nevada et al

Defendant: Dept of Human Services, Dept of Welfare Services and State Of Nevada
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown-Younger
Case Number: 2:2011cv00505
Filed: April 5, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall file the complaint; The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 6/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 14, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Compel; 17 Motion for Service of Process of Complaint and Summons; 19 Motion to Compel; 20 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery; and 29 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 15, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING 27 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions 6 and 8 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown-Younger v. State Of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Human Services
Represented By: Linda C. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Welfare Services
Represented By: Linda C. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Nevada
Represented By: Linda C. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown-Younger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]