Brown-Younger v. Mosen

Defendant: Robert and Mishy Mosen
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown-Younger
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00554
Filed: April 13, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a blank ifp application, and plaintiff shall have until 9/22/11 in which to submit the completed application or pay the $350.00 filing fee. Clerk shall retain Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 1, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 26 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until 11/28/11 to file her second amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that 10 Motion for Service is DENIED; 12 Motion to Increase Judgment Demand is DENIED; 13 Motion to Request Approval of IFP is DENIED as Moot; 14 Motion for Expedited Service of Process is DENIED; 15 Motio n for Expedited Hearing is DENIED; 16 Motion to Produce Records is DENIED; and 24 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 29 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 01/03/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown-Younger v. Mosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert and Mishy Mosen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown-Younger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]