O'Grady-Sullivan v. The State of Nevada et al

Defendant: Nevada Highway Patrol, Nye County Nevada, Nye County Sheriff's Office, Chris Perry, The State of Nevada, Jerry Hafen, Peter Hegge, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Chris Bennett and Anthony DeMeo
Plaintiff: Tara O'Grady-Sullivan
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00839
Filed: May 23, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 57 and 61 Motions for Summary Judgment. Denying 74 Motion for Permission to File Overlength Combined Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Joinder. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 24, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 104 and 105 Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment and Denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendants' Motions as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties are to file a joint proposed pretrial order within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 16, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 113 Motion for Reconsideration of Orders 101 and/or 111 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 15, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Motion to Dismiss 18 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Granted as to the following claims: (1) punitive damages for the state causes of action, (2) Eighth Amendment, (3) § 1983 claims against Hafen, Perry, Bennett, Demeo, Hegge, and the Doe Defendants in their official capacities, (4) § 1983 claims against the Nevada Department of Public Safety and the Nevada Highway Patrol, and (5) First Amendment Retaliation. Denied as to all other claims. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply 27 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 24, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Seal 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 23, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 65 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Courts Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 21, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 21, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties schedule a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: O'Grady-Sullivan v. The State of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Highway Patrol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Nevada
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Sheriff's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Perry
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nevada
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hafen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Hegge
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bennett
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeMeo
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara O'Grady-Sullivan
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]