United States of America v. 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550 et al

Defendant: VIN: ZFFEW58A3601497 2006 FERRARI F430, VIN: 5A7BB242X8T0025 2008 BOAT MATE TRAILER, SERIAL NO. ISRSF031A 2008 SUPRA 24 SUNSPORT, VIN: 5FNYF485X9B0500 2009 HONDA PILOT EX-L and VIN: WDBSK71F39F1426 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01133
Filed: July 8, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America and against SERIAL NO. ISRSF031A 2008 SUPRA 24 SUNSPORT, VIN: 5A7BB242X8T0025 2008 BOAT MATE TRAILER, VIN: 5FNYF485X9B0500 2009 HONDA PILOT EX-L, VIN: WDBSK71F39F1426 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550, and VIN: ZFFEW58A3601497 2006 FERRARI F430. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 17, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendants SERIAL NO. ISRSF031A 2008 SUPRA 24 SUNSPORT, VIN: 5A7BB242X8T0025 2008 BOAT MATE TRAILER, VIN: 5FNYF485X9B0500 2009 HONDA PILOT EX-L, VIN: WDBSK71F39F1426 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550 and VIN: ZFFEW58A3601497 2006 FERRARI F430. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 01/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 15, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Entry of Amended Clerk's Default and Amended Default Judgment of Forfeiture Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America and against (1) 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550 VIN: WDBSK71F39F142690; 2006 FERRARI F430 VIN: ZFFEW58A360149771; 2008 SUPRA 24 SUNSPORT SERIAL NO. ISRSF031A808; 2008 BOAT MA TE TRAILER VIN: 5A7BB242X8T002509; 2009 HONDA PILOT EX-L VIN: 5FNYF485X9B050010; (2) Robert Johnson and Guaranteed Loans, LLC; and (3) all other persons and entities having an interest in the defendant property. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN: ZFFEW58A3601497 2006 FERRARI F430
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN: 5A7BB242X8T0025 2008 BOAT MATE TRAILER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERIAL NO. ISRSF031A 2008 SUPRA 24 SUNSPORT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN: 5FNYF485X9B0500 2009 HONDA PILOT EX-L
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN: WDBSK71F39F1426 2009 MERCEDES-BENZ, MODEL SL550
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]