Bellagio, LLC et al v. Bellagio Shoes, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen and Bellagio Shoes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mirage Resorts, Inc. and Bellagio, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01975
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2012 20 AO 120 - REPORT on the determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (ECS)
February 27, 2012 19 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 27, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants Motion to Dismiss 10 is GRANTED without prejudice to Plaintiffs to re-file their action in the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 17, 2012 17 ERRATA to 16 Reply to Response to Motion ; Errata to Defendants' Declarations in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen. (Rosenthal, Robert)
February 16, 2012 16 REPLY to Response to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen. (Rosenthal, Robert)
February 14, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Replies due by 2/16/2012 re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 14, 2012 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) by Defendants Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen. (Rosenthal, Robert)
February 13, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4:00 p.m., February 23, 2012. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 3, 2012 12 RESPONSE to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiffs Bellagio, LLC, Mirage Resorts, Inc.. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration April Chaparian, # 2 Exhibit A to Chaparian Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Chaparian Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Chaparian Declaration, # 5 Declaration Jonathan W. Fountain, # 6 Declaration Priyanka Menon, # 7 Exhibit A to Menon Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B to Menon Declaration, # 9 Exhibit C to Menon Declaration, # 10 Exhibit D to Menon Declaration, # 11 Exhibit E to Menon Declaration, # 12 Exhibit F to Menon Declaration, # 13 Declaration Damian Pryor, # 14 Declaration Sid Taoatao)(Fountain, Jonathan)
January 19, 2012 11 ERRATA to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen. (Rosenthal, Robert)
January 17, 2012 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., Shlomo Ronen. Responses due by 2/3/2012. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/27/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2012. (Rosenthal, Robert)
January 3, 2012 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirage Resorts, Inc., Bellagio, LLC. Shlomo Ronen served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 3, 2012 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirage Resorts, Inc., Bellagio, LLC. Itzhak Ben Shoshan served on 12/23/2011, answer due 1/13/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 3, 2012 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirage Resorts, Inc., Bellagio, LLC. Bertini Shoes, Inc. served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 3, 2012 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirage Resorts, Inc., Bellagio, LLC. Bellagio Shoes, Inc. served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 9, 2011 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
December 9, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to Bellagio Shoes, Inc., Itzhak Ben Shoshan, Bertini Shoes, Inc., and Shlomo Ronen. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to Bertini Shoes, # 2 Summons Issued as to Itzhak Ben Shoshan, # 3 Summons Issued as to Shlomo Ronen)(EDS)
December 9, 2011 3 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 8, 2011 Case assigned to Judge Philip M. Pro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (EDS)
December 8, 2011 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bellagio, LLC, Mirage Resorts, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mirage Resorts, Inc., Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for Bellagio, LLC; Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for Mirage Resorts, Inc. added.. (McCue, Michael)
December 8, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2206795), filed by Mirage Resorts, Inc., Bellagio, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/18/2011. Proof of service due by 4/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bellagio Shoes, # 3 Summons Shlomo Ronen, # 4 Summons Bertini Shoes, # 5 Summons Itzhak Ben Shoshan) (McCue, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellagio, LLC et al v. Bellagio Shoes, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itzhak Ben Shoshan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertini Shoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlomo Ronen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellagio Shoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirage Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellagio, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]