Thermapure, Inc. v. Advanced Pro Remediation, LLC

Plaintiff: Thermapure, Inc.
Defendant: Advanced Pro Remediation, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02012
Filed: December 16, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 18 Featured Case PATENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 26, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall file a status report by 03/17/2013 advising whether the parties wish to proceed with a claim construction hearing or are otherwise resolving this action. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 02/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 4, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action and Retention of Jurisdiction. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 03/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thermapure, Inc. v. Advanced Pro Remediation, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thermapure, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Sean M. Kneafsey
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Shaun Swiger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pro Remediation, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]