Ghebremeskel v. Holder et al

Plaintiff: Ahmed Yusuf Al Hussein, Leila Haile Ghebremeskel and Sara Tsehaie Ghezehei
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr., Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary Janet Napolitano, Mr. David L. Roark and Lynne Skeirik
Case Number: 2:2012cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 8/29/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. Denying 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 4, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 and 18 Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 30, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all parties are to submit to this Court a Joint Status Report within 30 days of the issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 19 Order on Motion to Stay is EXTENDED. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a status report with this Court every 90 days until the stay is lifted. The next status report is due 12/17/2013. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 6, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs comply with this Court's prior order and provide status reports every 90 days. Plaintiffs' next status report must be filed with this Court no later than March 27, 2015. To be clear, failure to file a status report with this Court by March 27, 2015 will result in dismissal and closure of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 30, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is Dismissed and the case closed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghebremeskel v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Yusuf Al Hussein
Represented By: Seth L Reszko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Haile Ghebremeskel
Represented By: Seth L Reszko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Tsehaie Ghezehei
Represented By: Seth L Reszko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. David L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Skeirik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]