Aevoe Corp. v. Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.

Counter Claimant: Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.
Defendant: Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.
Counter Defendant: Aevoe Corp.
Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00054
Filed: January 11, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd. answer due 1/18/2012. Replies due by 1/20/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 24, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 24, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 26, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 1, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 35 Motion for Relief from 31 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 1, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 14, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The law firm Weide & Miller, Ltd., withdrawn from the case. Attorneys Viau and Lee shall designate local counsel who shall file a notice of appearance in accordance with the Local Rules on or before July 2, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 15, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that sanctions in the amount of $17,406.97 are awarded to Plaintiff for costs and attorneys fees incurred by McDonald Carano Wilson and Winston & Strawn against Shenzhen and its counsel, Mr. Lee, jointly and severally, for their failure to comply with the courts Order 56 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 3, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Aevoe Corp. v. Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan R Gile
Represented By: Kendelee Leascher-Works
Represented By: Otto Lee
Represented By: Kevin Viau
Represented By: R. Scott Weide
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Membrane Precise Electron Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan R Gile
Represented By: Kendelee Leascher-Works
Represented By: Otto Lee
Represented By: Kevin Viau
Represented By: R. Scott Weide
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Golinveaux
Represented By: Beth A Derby
Represented By: David S Bloch
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: K Joon Oh
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: David S Bloch
Represented By: Beth A Derby
Represented By: Jennifer Golinveaux
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: K Joon Oh
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]