Cybergun S.A. et al v. JAG Precision

Plaintiff: Cybergun S.A. and FN Herstal S.A.
Defendant: JAG Precision
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00074
Filed: January 17, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant shall pay Plaintiffs $11,520.00 in attorneys fees within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 18, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Plaintiffs shall post a bond of $10,000.00 in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). Responses due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 1/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 118 Motion to Seal 117 Response to 116 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of the First and Sixth Causes of Action in the 28 Amended Complaint and certain exhibits. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 20, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 119 Motion to Seal 120 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and 123 Exhibits A-C to the 122 Declaration of Richard T. Jackson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 20, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 125 Motion to Seal 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Fifth Counterclaim of Laches and Thirty-Fourth Affirmative Defense of Statute of Limitations and 129 Exhibits A-C to the 127 Declaration of Brett L. Foster. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 24, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 138 Motion to Seal 139 Motion for Summary Judgment re Trade Dress In and 141 Exhibits A, D, I, and N-R to the 140 Declaration of Brett L. Foster. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 25, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 143 Motion to Seal re 142 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's 116 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. There is good cause to seal 145 Exhibits B-C to the 144 Declaration of Brett L. Foster. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 10, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 150 Motion to Seal JAG Response to Plaintiff Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 18, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 167 Motion to Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re Trade Dress Infringement and Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 18, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 157 Motion to Seal (1) Motion to Exclude Testimony from Howard D. Kent and related documents; (2) Motion to Strike Chris Butler; and (3) Opposition to Jags Motions for Summary Judgment and related documents. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 18, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 162 Motion to Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Fifth Counterclaim of Laches and Thirty-Fourth Affirmative Defense of Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 176 Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaim of Business Interference. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 26, 2014 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 179 Motion to Seal Cybergun's Reply in Support of 139 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 4, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 184 Motion to Seal 186 Response to Motion to Strike, 187 Exhibits, and 188 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 15, 2014 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 201 Motion to Seal Reply to 158 Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Papers re Employee Expert Testimony and Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of David K. Lin. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 15, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 196 Motion to Seal 200 Reply to Response re 158 Motion to Strike Previously Undisclosed Witness, Chris Butler and Previously Undisclosed Documents and [197 ] Reply to Response re 159 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Expert Howard D. Kent and 199 Exhibit C. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 1, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 6, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 11, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties are Ordered to address the relevance of Secalt to their positions. Defendant shall file a supplemental brief within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs shall file a reply within 14 days. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 07/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 11, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a proposed injunction within 10 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 29, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Regarding Defendants Replicas of Plaintiffs' M249 and P90 Guns. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 10, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting as stated on the record 75 MOTION to Compel. Memorandum due within 14 days. Responses due 10 days after filing of the Memorandum. Replies due 7 days after Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cybergun S.A. et al v. JAG Precision
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cybergun S.A.
Represented By: Richard T. Jackson
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: J. Stephen Peek
Represented By: Michael Wadley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FN Herstal S.A.
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: Richard T. Jackson
Represented By: J. Stephen Peek
Represented By: Michael Wadley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAG Precision
Represented By: James A. Kohl
Represented By: Robert L Rosenthal
Represented By: Thomas I. Rozsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]