Nichols v. Findlay Automotive Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Michael Nichols
Defendant: Findlay Automotive Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00093
Filed: January 19, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Additional Time. Discovery due by 5/13/2013. Motions due by 6/12/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/12/2013. All other discovery deadlines as stated in the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order 22 will remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Keith A. Vogt substituted in place and stead of Steven Pedersen for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 29, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without attorneys' fees or costs awarded to any party. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nichols v. Findlay Automotive Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Nichols
Represented By: Keith Vogt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay Automotive Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]