Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.

Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde and Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Counter Defendant: University of Strathclyde and Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00111
Filed: January 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 134 Featured Case ORDER Denying 100 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Inequitable Conduct Counterclaim and Affirmative Defense. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 29, 2013 152 Featured Case ORDER Amending 42 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 7, 2013 156 Featured Case ORDER Granting 155 Declaration of Anders Aennestad in Support of Sealing Portions of 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 3, 2013 178 Featured Case ORDER re 175 MOTION to Seal filed by Sandoz Inc. Defendant shall file no later than 12/11/13 either a declaration establishing compelling reasons for the sealing of each document at issue, or withdraw the designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDER re 175 MOTION to Seal. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED, no later than December 20, 2013, to either file a declaration establishing compelling reasons for the sealing of each document at issue, or withdraw the designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2013 190 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 187 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 26, 2013 197 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 175 Defendant's Motion to Seal. The motion is GRANTED with respect to the sealing of Exhibits Defendants proposed redaction of Exhibits 12, 18, 36 and 47. The motion is DENIED with respect to th e sealing of Exhibits 2, 5, 22, 30, 32-35, 37, 39, 41, 44, and 45. Docket 168 will remain under seal, but Defendant is ordered to file the unsealed exhibits on the public docket no later than 1/10/14. With regard to the Roberts Declaration, the mo tion is DENIED. The Court orders 164 unsealed. With regard to the Cekola Declaration, the motion to seal is GRANTED. Docket 160 shall remain under seal. With regard to the Martin Declaration, the motion to seal is DENIED. The Court orders [17 1] unsealed. With regard to the responses to the motions for summary judgment and the Declarations, the motion to seal is DENIED. Defendant is ordered to file, no later than 1/15/2014, newly-redacted versions of those responses and Declarations, consistent with the Court's instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 31, 2013 198 Featured Case ORDER Granting 192 Motion to Seal 185 Reply to Response to Motion, and 186 Declaration. The unredacted reply and exhibits at 191 will remain under seal and no further filing of redacted versions is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 31, 2013 199 Featured Case ORDER that the proposed construction of the nine (9) terms submitted by the parties are construed as contained within this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that claims 13 and 14 are both dependent claims. Claim 13 depends from claim 11. Claim 14 depends from claim 10. FURTHER ORDERED that claim 13 is invalid as improperly dependent from claim 11. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for the setting of the Post-Claim Construction Order Settlement Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1-19(b). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2014 202 Featured Case ORDER correcting a clerical error in the original Order filed on December 31, 2013 at ECF 199 , as follows: on page 8, FN1, diastereoisomer is corrected to read diastereoisbmer. All other aspects of the original Order remain the same. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/14. NUNC PRO TUNC DATE: December 31, 2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2014 220 Featured Case ORDER Granting 216 Defendant's Motion to Seal. Docket Nos. 212 and 214 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 30, 2014 225 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment 140 , 146 , and 150 are STRICKEN. FURTHER ORDERED that 213 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Dispositive Motions Deadline is extended until June 30, 2014, for the limited purpose of allowing each party to file a Motion for Summary Judgment that complies with Local Rule 7-4. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2014 226 Featured Case ORDER that 224 Joint Motion for Status Conference is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 1, 2014 241 Featured Case ORDER that 228 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Docket Nos. 229, 231 and 233 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 1, 2014 242 Featured Case ORDER Granting 239 Motion to Seal Exhibit to the Declaration of Amanda K. Antons in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Docket No. 238 shall therefore remain under seal at this time. The Court further ORDERS that, within one day of serving the opposing party in the Ben Venue Litigation with this report, Plaintiffs must file Exhibit 5 on the public docket in the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2012 42 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Keane
Represented By: David C. Doyle
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Anders T. Aannestad
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Anders T. Aannestad
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: David C. Doyle
Represented By: Stephen D. Keane
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]