Nike, Inc. et al v. QiLoo International Limited Featured Case

Plaintiff: Nike, Inc. and Converse, Inc.
Defendant: QiLoo International Limited
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00191
Filed: February 6, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER on 30 Surety Bond filed by Converse, Inc. and Nike, Inc. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 2, 2012 30 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 25000 posted by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc. and Nike, Inc. Receipt # 55352. (ASB)
March 22, 2012 29 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall post a new surety bond for $25,000.00 to remain in place until the trial on the merits. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/22/12. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 20, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Renk and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael McCue for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/20/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 20, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Azuka Dike and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael McCue for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/20/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 20, 2012 26 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Renk and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2310273) by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/20/2012. (McCue, Michael)
March 20, 2012 25 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Azuka C. Dike and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2310260) by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/20/2012. (McCue, Michael)
March 20, 2012 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 24 AO 120 Patent & Trademark Form: ERROR: Wrong event selected; CORRECTION: Court modified event as 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (no image attached)(RFJ)
March 16, 2012 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 22 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing; held on 2-16-12, before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 775-786-5584. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER ( Redaction Request due 4/6/2012., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2012.) (KF) Event modified on 3/20/2012 (RFJ).
February 29, 2012 23 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 17, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik S. Maurer and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Michael J. McCue for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/16/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 16, 2012 22 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2012 before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: M. Jaime; Pla Counsel: Michael McCue; Erik Maurer; Brian Fogarty, Assitant General Counsel for Nike, Inc.; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 2:53 - 3:12 p.m.; Courtroom: 7D; Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice 20 is GRANTED. The Court makes statements for the record and hears representations of counsel. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11 is GRANTED including, Exhibit JJ: product number QL-21193. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
February 16, 2012 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erik S. Maurer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 200) by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc. and Nike, Inc. Motion ripe 2/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt # 9463)(ASB)
February 14, 2012 19 REPLY to Response to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 9, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct 12 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 8, 2012 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Temporary Restraining Order,. by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. Responses due by 2/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended TRO)(Fountain, Jonathan)
February 8, 2012 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against QiLoo International Limited, filed by Nike, Inc., Converse, Inc.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 6/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC, # 56 Exhibit DDD, # 57 Exhibit EEE, # 58 Exhibit FFF, # 59 Exhibit GGG) (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 8, 2012 14 NOTICE re: 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; filed by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc. (Fountain, Jonathan) Added docket entry relationship on 2/9/2012 (RFJ).
February 7, 2012 13 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ $25,000.00 posted by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc. and Nike, Inc. Bond # 023-020-373. (ASB)
February 7, 2012 12 Featured Case EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Granting 4 Motion for TRO. 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Deadlines: Responses due by 2/10/2012. Replies due by 2/14/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2012 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 6, 2012 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; filed by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2012. (SRK)
February 6, 2012 7 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (ASB)
February 6, 2012 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (ASB)
February 6, 2012 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. Motion ripe 2/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kelly Hibler, # 2 Declaration Wayne Patrick Seehafer, # 3 Declaration Thomas Scavuzzo, # 4 Declaration Erik S. Maurer, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB, # 33 Exhibit CC, # 34 Exhibit DD, # 35 Exhibit EE, # 36 Exhibit FF, # 37 Exhibit GG, # 38 Exhibit HH, # 39 Exhibit II, # 40 Exhibit JJ, # 41 Exhibit KK, # 42 Exhibit LL, # 43 Exhibit MM, # 44 Exhibit NN, # 45 Exhibit OO, # 46 Exhibit PP, # 47 Exhibit QQ, # 48 Memorandum Of Law, # 49 Proposed Order)(Fountain, Jonathan)
February 6, 2012 2 EXHIBIT(s) to 1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs Converse, Inc., Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit Z, # 26 Exhibit AA, # 27 Exhibit BB, # 28 Exhibit CC, # 29 Exhibit DD, # 30 Exhibit EE, # 31 Exhibit FF, # 32 Exhibit GG, # 33 Exhibit HH, # 34 Exhibit II, # 35 Exhibit JJ, # 36 Exhibit KK, # 37 Exhibit LL, # 38 Exhibit MM)(Fountain, Jonathan)
February 6, 2012 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against QiLoo International Limited (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2263948), filed by Nike, Inc., Converse, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/16/2012. Proof of service due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons QiLoo Int'l Ltd.) (Fountain, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nike, Inc. et al v. QiLoo International Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Azuka Dike
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Harris
Represented By: Erik S Maurer
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Christopher Renk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Converse, Inc.
Represented By: Azuka Dike
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael Joseph Harris
Represented By: Erik S Maurer
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Christopher Renk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QiLoo International Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]