Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. et al

Defendant: Wirsbo Company, Uponor Corporation, Uponor Wirsbo Company, Uponor, Inc., VG Pipe, LLC, Vanguard Industries, Inc., Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega GMBH & Co. KG, Viega International GMBH, Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC and Del Webb Communities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthem Highlands Community Association
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00207
Filed: February 9, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Request for Order Appointing Special Process Service filed by Anthem Highlands Community Association Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 16, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 39 Motion to Stay Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 7, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 50 Defendants' Motion for Stay of Issuance of Discovery Scheduling Order Pending 6/21/12 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 14, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all motions in the present case are DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 8, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims related to the Vanguard/Viega plumbing system are SEVERED from the following cases: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. , No. 2:12-cv-207. FURTHER ORDERED that the Vanguard/Viega claims severed from the Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-2 07 actions are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including discovery and trial, as member cases into the lead Vanguard/Viega case Waterfall Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1498. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in the consolidated Uponor/Wirsbo and Vanguard/Viega actions shall be coordinated to the greatest extent possible so as to minimize the expense and burden on all parties in these actions.FURTHER ORDERED that all further Vanguard/Viega-related plead ings and papers shall be filed in the lead Vanguard/Viega case only. Plaintiffs in the lead Vanguard/Viega case shall have leave to file a consolidated amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this order. The amended complaint shall not add addit ional legal theories and shall conform to all of the Courts prior orders in the Waterfall action.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter this Order into the dockets of this action, the lead Vanguard case, and the two Vanguard member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VG Pipe, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega GMBH & Co. KG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega International GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Webb Communities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Represented By: James D. Carraway
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Francis I Lynch
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]