U-Haul Co. of Nevada, Inc. et al v. Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd. et al

Defendant: Jennifer A. Cory, Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd. and Debra Wilcher
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd.
Plaintiff: U-Haul Co. of Nevada, Inc. and U-Haul International, Inc.
ThirdParty Defendant: United States and Stephen Wamser
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00231
Filed: February 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 29, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 58 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Estate of Nathan Albright. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 15, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 106 Stipulation for Extension of Time and Denying 160 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Prior Stipulation for Continuance of Discovery as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 21, 2013 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Defendant's Motion to Strike Paragraph 19 of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 02/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 26, 2013 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 94 Emergency Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are ordered to produce all discovery identified above within seven days of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to bear their own expenses incurred in bringing and opposing this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 26, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 75 Defendant's Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Denying 81 Plaintiffs' Counter-motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a written joint status report by 04/05/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 26, 2013 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 60 Defendant's Motion to Compel is Granted in part and Denied in part without prejudice as to the evidentiary rulings, and Denied in part, as discussed in order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kamer may use any documents in its posse ssion related to the NLRB Proceedings in any future depositions allowed by this Court or for any other lawful purpose. Plaintiffs are ordered to produce all billing records from the Subsequent Law Firms in unredacted form to Kamer within 7 days of this order. The parties are to bear their own expenses incurred in bringing and opposing this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Jennifer Corry. Norman H. Kirshman withdrawn from the case. Designation of New Counsel due by 3/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 20, 2013 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 234 Defendant's Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery should go forward as ordered in the 227 Courts Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 05/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 19, 2013 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert Witnesses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 19, 2013 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 236 Defendant's Objection to the Order Concerning Joint Status Report on Reopening Discovery. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 19, 2013 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 229 Defendant Kamer's Partial Objection to Order Regarding Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 19, 2013 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 230 Defendant Wilcher's Objection to the Order Concerning Defendant, Debra Wilcher's, Emergency Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2013 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 116 Defendant Wilcher's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2013 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 123 Defendant Wilcher's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second and Third Causes of Action Re: Fraud and Constructive Fraud. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2013 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 119 Defendant Kamer's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Thirteenth Claim for Unjust Enrichment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2013 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 122 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2013 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 124 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2013 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 132 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2013 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 129 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2013 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 131 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Fifth Cause of Action for Legal Malpractice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 29, 2013 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 133 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs Claim for Damages Relative to Attorneys Fees in the Underlying ULP Proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs recalculate damages excluding all fees stemming from the exceptions or other appeal-related work. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 08/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 29, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Claims for Damages Based on Settlement. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 17, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 248 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The parties shall bear their own fees in relation to the motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion hearing set for 9/23/13 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that dispositive motions are sue 10/17/13. Pretrial order due 11/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 8, 2013 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is STAYED until November 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the Filing of a Joint Interim Discovery Status Report by 6/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 11, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 United States' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Denying 20 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court. United States and Stephen Wamser terminated. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 07/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: U-Haul Co. of Nevada, Inc. et al v. Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer A. Cory
Represented By: Norman H. Kirshman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar Carranza
Represented By: Leland E. Backus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Wilcher
Represented By: Nathan Reinmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Gregory J. Kamer, Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar Carranza
Represented By: Leland E. Backus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U-Haul Co. of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U-Haul International, Inc.
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: United States
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Stephen Wamser
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]