Barket v. Clark

Defendant: Tom Clark and Steve Smith
Plaintiff: Steve Barket
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00393
Filed: March 9, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part counterdefendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order in accordance with the foregoing provisions of order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 02/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than March 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barket v. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Barket
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Represented By: Brian A Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]