Caldwell v. Compass Entertainment Group LLC et al

Defendant: Rounder, Inc., Gregory J. McDonald, Gregory T. McDonald, Jeffrey P. Kranzdorf, Suzanne M. Labelle, Thomas A. McDonald and Compass Entertainment Group LLC
Plaintiff: Evert Caldwell
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00458
Filed: March 19, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 23 Motion to Allow for Service by Publication; and Denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Extend Time for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 27, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Extend Time for Service. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Motion for Service by Publication is Granted in part and Denied in part. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 18, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 12 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Quash Service is GRANTED to the extent that service of process executed on April 12, 2012 is QUASHED. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant file notice within ten days of the entry of this order whether he is authorized to accept service of process on behalf of Defendant Kranzdorf. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 15 / 16 Motion to Dismiss; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint in compliance with this order within 1 4 days of entry of this order, failure to do so will result in the action being dismissed with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss based on improper is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend complaint. Plaintiff's claims alleged in Counts III, IV, and VIII, are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may proceed with Counts I, II, V, VI, VII, and IX. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 01/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 16, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Compass Entertainment Group LLC answer due 5/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 24, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 5/15/12, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial and is familiar with the Electronic Filing Procedures, Best Practices, and the Civil & Criminal Events Menue that are accessible on this court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Caldwell v. Compass Entertainment Group LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rounder, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory T. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Kranzdorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Labelle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Entertainment Group LLC
Represented By: Armand Fried
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evert Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]