United States of America v. Cellini et al

Defendant: Harry Portnoy and Marge L. Cellini
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00471
Filed: March 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear as to Attorney Richard G. Rose. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 10, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING 22 Report and Recommendation. The Order of Permanent Injunction, attached to Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's Report and Recommendation, shall be entered by the Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 10, 2013 25 Featured Case PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Defendant Marge L. Cellini. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 10, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 11, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2014 31 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT of PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of United States of America against Harry Portnoy. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Cellini et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Portnoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marge L. Cellini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard G. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]