Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC v. Florida Entertainment Management, Inc. et al

Defendant: Larry Marshak and Florida Entertainment Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
Counter Claimant: Larry Marshak and Florida Entertainment Management, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00560
Filed: April 4, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 139 Featured Case ORDER Granting 99 Plaintiff Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 106 Defendants Florida Entertainment Management, Inc. and Larry Marshak's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 109 and 119 Plaintiff's Motions to Strike are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 104 , 112 , and 122 Parties' Motions to Seal are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 21, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than July 2, 2012 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 24, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 is GRANTED to the following extent: Defendants and their agents are preliminary enjoined from use of the mark The Platters, and any equivalent or phonetical ly similar names or marks, in connection with any vocal group in any advertisements, promotional marketing, or other materials, with two narrow exceptions. First, Defendants may use the mark The Platters in connection with the names Larry Marshak 9;s Tribute to The Platters or Larry Marshak's Salute to The Platters. The words tribute or salute must be at least one half the font size of the words The Platters in any of Defendants' advertising. Second, Defendants may use the mark The Platters in any other manner with Plaintiff's permission. Plaintiff shall secure this Preliminary Injunction by posting a bond in the amount of $10,000 with the Clerk of the Court within five (5) calendar days from the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cc: Finance)
October 29, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Further Orders. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 2, 2012 83 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC v. Florida Entertainment Management, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Marshak
Represented By: Yuval H. Marcu
Represented By: Cameron S. Reuber
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Entertainment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Yuval H. Marcu
Represented By: Cameron S. Reuber
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Eric M Sommers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Larry Marshak
Represented By: Yuval H. Marcu
Represented By: Cameron S. Reuber
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Florida Entertainment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Represented By: Cameron S. Reuber
Represented By: Yuval H. Marcu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Eric M Sommers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]