Hernandez v Hillsboro Enterprises Inc et al

Defendant: Vincent Bartello, Hillsboro Enterprises,Inc., Frances Hogan and L.A. Foxes, LLC
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Hernandez, Patricia Hernandez, Imelda Renteria and Emmanuel Tellez
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00575
Filed: April 9, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation for Substitution of Attorneys filed by Defendants Vincent Bartello and Hillsboro Enterprises,Inc. Attorney Barney C. Ales substituted in the place of Attorneys Rick D Roskelley, Dustin L. Clark, and Kristina Escamilla Gilmore as to Defendants Vincent Bartello and Hillsboro Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 12/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 26, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' 9 First Amended Class Action Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by 10/19/2013. Failure to do so by this date will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 8 Motion for Order Shortening Time are Denied. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' claims are Dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hernandez v Hillsboro Enterprises Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Bartello
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsboro Enterprises,Inc.
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Hogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. Foxes, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Renteria
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Tellez
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]