Adele v. Dunn, Jr. et al

Defendant: Lyle Jacob Dunn, Jr. and R.W. Jacks Trucking Company
Plaintiff: Clifford Adele
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00597
Filed: April 12, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 22 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall have until 11/19/2012, in which to serve Defendants with Answer to Interrogatory No. 8, and to respond to Request for Production No. 14 as ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 26, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Attend FRCP 35 Evaluation with James Olson, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 26, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 29 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel. A Status and Dispute Resolution Conference is set for 12/4/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Parties shall submit a joint status report by 12:00 pm, 12/3/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 14, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 53 Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines consistent with the body of this Order. Defendants shall serve Plaintiff with Dr. Olsens report no later than 02/26/2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Psychological Records is GRANTED and 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Psychological Records from the Record is DENIED consistent with this order. Exhibit D to 53 Defendants' M otion to Extend Discovery shall remain SEALED. 57 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause is DENIED. 59 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Submit Under Seal is GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 27, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Negligent Entrustment and Negligent Training and Supervision Causes of Action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Third (Negligent Entrustment) and Fourth (Negligent Training and Supervision) Claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 03/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 24, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 07/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adele v. Dunn, Jr. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Jacob Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Jacks Trucking Company
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Adele
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]