szabo v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Daniel Szabo
Case Number: 2:2012cv00676
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a joint Interim Discovery Status Report on October 30, 2012. Joint Interim Discovery Status Report due by 10/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 09/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 23, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 11 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 16 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: szabo v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Szabo
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Lawrence M. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.