Vaca et al v. Sky View Academy LLC et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Vaca and Cynthia Shepherd
Defendant: World Wide Association of Specialty Programs and Schools, Inc., Sky View Christian Academy, Lifelines Family Services, LLC, Sky View Academy LLC, Lifelines Family Services, Inc. and Orval Hagerman
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00814
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a status report, motion for entry of default judgment, or notice of voluntarily dismissal no later than January 2, 2013. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 4, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Robert Spear, Esq. shall, within 7 days of the date of this Order, file a certificate of service for his 37 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 26, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Status Report by 3/10/2014 advising the Court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vaca et al v. Sky View Academy LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vaca
Represented By: E. Robert Spear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Shepherd
Represented By: E. Robert Spear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wide Association of Specialty Programs and Schools, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky View Christian Academy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifelines Family Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky View Academy LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifelines Family Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orval Hagerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]