Liptak v. Ally Bank et al

Defendant: Sears, Roebuck & Co., Ally Bank, Bank Of America, IRS/United States and Public Legal Education Associates, LC
Plaintiff: V.F. Liptak
Case Number: 2:2012cv00882
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Defendant Ally Bank's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 5, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 1 Complaint. V.F. Liptak answer due 11/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of District Judge. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 03/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Sears, Roebuck & Co. terminated. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 03/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 28, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Bank of America. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a written response to the Courts order to show cause within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 05/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 28, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Defendants IRS, United States, and Public Legal Education Associates, LC and against Plaintiff. IRS/United States and Public Legal Education Associates, LC terminated. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 05/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 2, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment or Personally Serve the Attorney General or for Leave to Replead or Extension of Time to Appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted a 30 day e xtension of time from the date of this order to file his NOTICE OF APPEAL. The Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Defendants Bank of America, Sears, Roebuck & Co., and Ally Bank and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liptak v. Ally Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck & Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS/United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Legal Education Associates, LC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.F. Liptak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]