Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. Sergej Letyagin

Defendant: Sergej Letyagin
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00923
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting, as enumerated in the Order, 13 Motion for Leave to Conduct Immediate Discovery. (See Order for Details). FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Cross-Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in regard to other discovery, unless otherwise authorized by court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Liberty Media is granted discovery limited to the issue of the court's personal jurisdiction over Letyagin and Ideal. Such discovery must be completed on or before May 31, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Liberty Media's Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 21, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff and Defendants will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs related to this litigation, with all rights of appeal waived. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 6, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the documents contained in Plaintiff's Motion for Order Temporarily Sealing the Portions of the File shall be filed under seal. ORDERED that the documents contained in Plaintiff's Motion for Order Permitting Alternate Service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendants shall be filed under seal. ORDERED that the Complaint and supporting documents shall be filed under seal. ORDERED that immediately upon the Plaintiff filing a return of service indicating service by email, that the seal shall automatically dissolve. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Service. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. Sergej Letyagin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergej Letyagin
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Evan Fray-Witzer
Represented By: Valentin D. Gurvits
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]