Anoruo v. Shinseki

Plaintiff: Joseph Chidi Anoruo
Defendant: Erick K. Shinseki
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01190
Filed: July 6, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 95 Memorandum of Costs. Plaintiff shall pay the United States Attorney's Office, District of Nevada, $280.50 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 18, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 10, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 134 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 114 , 122 , and 123 Motions to Amend, 115 and 121 Motions to Recuse, and 138 Motion to Strike, are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 133 and 142 Motions for Reconsideration are DENIED as duplicative. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 145 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 146 Plaintiff's Motion to Merge is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 25, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 29, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Strike 13 Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 27, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Joseph Anoruo shall have until 12/7/2012 to respond to 22 Defendant's MOTION to Compel /Issue Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 25 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Defendant Erick K. Shinseki's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of the Complaint. Plaintiff's other claims are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, if he chooses to amend his complaint, file the motion to amend, attaching the proposed amended complaint, within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Motion for Re-Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 Defendant's Motion to Strike Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is stricken. In the event Plaintiff elects to seek leave to file an amended complaint, he may do so on or before March 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 18, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 5, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 20, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 70 and 71 Plaintiff's Motions to Reopen Discovery and Extend Certain Deadlines and 75 and 76 Plaintiff's Amended Motions to Reopen Discovery and Extend Certain Deadlines. Discovery due b y 10/18/2013. Motions due by 11/18/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2013. Defendant has until 9/19/2013 to file written responses to Plaintiff's request for admissions, supplemental interrogatories and supplemental requests for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 27, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Counsel for Defendant shall serve and file a memorandum within 14 days from entry of this Order. Plaintiff has 14 days from service of the memorandum to file a response. Counsel for Defendant has 7 days from service of the response to file a reply. Defendant's 52 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 49 Amended Complaint is stricken. Defendant's 66 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 57 Second Amended Complaint is stricken. Defendant's 81 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 69 Third Amended Complaint is stricken. Defendant's 82 Motion to Strike Sur-reply is Granetd . Plaintiff's 77 Supplemental Memorandum is stricken. Defendant's 83 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's 74 Revised Third Amended Complaint is stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 28, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 86 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/19/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 17, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 94 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anoruo v. Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Chidi Anoruo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick K. Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]