Schneider v. Commissioner Of Social Security Adm.

Plaintiff: Lorin F. Schneider
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Adm.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01375
Filed: August 3, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Serve Additional Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Office of the Regional Chief Counsel - SLR)
January 28, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 15 Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 8, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 1 is granted with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S . Marshal for service. Defendants shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. Plaintiffs counsel, Mr. Kalagian, shall have 14 days from the date of this order to comply with LR IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 21, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 31 Report and Recommendation. Granting 23 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 27, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is entitled to an award of fees in the amount of $4,146.36. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissioner shall pay $4,146.36 to Lorin F. Schneider, but if t he Department of the Treasury determines that Lorin F. Schneider does not owe a federal debt, then the government shall cause the payment of fees to be made directly to Marc V. Kalagian as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) and in accordance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 27, 2014 37 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Lorin F. Schneider against Commissioner of Social Security Administration in the amount of $4,146.36. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schneider v. Commissioner Of Social Security Adm.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorin F. Schneider
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Adm.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]