Soffer et al v. Five Capital Partners LLC et al

Plaintiff: J&JS Town Square, LLC, Jacquelyn Soffer, Jeffrey Soffer, Turnberry Capital, LLC and Turnberry Town Square, LLC
Defendant: David J Lattimer, Five Mile Capital Partners LLC, James G Glasgow, Jr., Five Mile Capital II Town Square SPE LLC and Five Mile Capital II Pooling International LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01407
Filed: August 8, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 27 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs, if they chooses to amend their complaint, file the motion to amend, attaching the proposed amended complaint, within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 02/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 6, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER Denying 47 Defendants' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 44 Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 19, 2013 69 Featured Case ORDER Denying 56 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and to Extend Discovery Deadline to Complete Discovery without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 08/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Soffer et al v. Five Capital Partners LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&JS Town Square, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Soffer
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Soffer
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turnberry Capital, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turnberry Town Square, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Lattimer
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G Glasgow, Jr.
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital II Town Square SPE LLC
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital II Pooling International LLC
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]