United States of Ameria v. $196,000 In United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of Ameria
Defendant: $196,000 In United States Currency
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01409
Filed: August 8, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Unopposed Motion to Strike Part of the Notice of Electronic Filing Requiring Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 29, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the government shall have until December 11, 2012, in which to produce its initial discovery disclosures. Counsel for the parties shall have until December 26, 2012, to meet and confer. The parties shall have until January 2, 2013, in which to submit a proposed case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America and against Darren Hall. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE is entered against the $196,000 in United States Currency, Darren Hall, and all persons or entities who claim an interest in the defendant property in the above-entitled action. FURTHER ORDERED, that said propert y be, and the same is hereby forfeited to the United States of America, and no right, title, or interest in the property shall exist in any other party. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465(a)(2), that there was reasonable cause for the seizure or arrest of the defendant property. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 14, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Summons and Warrant of Arrest in REM for the Property and Notice Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of Ameria v. $196,000 In United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of Ameria
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $196,000 In United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]