Webster et al v. National Default Servicing Corporation, Inc. et al

Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: James F. Webster and Oksana Webster
Case Number: 2:2012cv01482
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All claims are DISMISSED except those for violations of NRS 107.080. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 4 Defendants' Motion to Remove Lis Pendens is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 4:00 p.m., 08/08/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 07/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal. Each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster et al v. National Default Servicing Corporation, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin S. Soderstrom
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Webster
Represented By: Yvette R Freedman
Represented By: John Peter Lee
Represented By: James J. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oksana Webster
Represented By: Yvette R Freedman
Represented By: John Peter Lee
Represented By: James J. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]