Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Elefante et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Daniel J. Elefante and Theodore H. Toch
Case Number: 2:2012cv01521
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 09/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Elefante et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ann Marie McLoughlin
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Elefante
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore H. Toch
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.