Monteiro et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al

Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Management Limited, Johnson & Johnson Medical Limited, Precision Instruments, Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. and DePuy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rose Monteiro and Priscilla Gordon
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01576
Filed: September 5, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and for Continuance to File Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The deadline for submitting the Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is continued until decision ondefendants' 2 Mo tion to Stay and/or plaintiffs' 6 Motion to Remand. Ifboth motions are denied, the parties shall submit a stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order within 15 days after entry of the order denying the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 12, 2012 27 Featured Case MDL ORDER Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by MDL on 12/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2012 28 Featured Case CERTIFIED MDL ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by MDL on 12/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monteiro et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Management Limited
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Medical Limited
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Monteiro
Represented By: Lindsay K Eaton
Represented By: Brian S. Franciskato
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Gordon
Represented By: Lindsay K Eaton
Represented By: Brian S. Franciskato
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]