Pujol v. Bank of America Home Loans, N.A. et al

Defendant: Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-MLNI, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS), Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America Home Loans, N.A. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Hiran Pujol
Case Number: 2:2012cv01616
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 29, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The case is hereby dismissed as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A. for itself and as successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. as trustee for the c ertificate holders of Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Back Certificates, Series 2007-MLN1; and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 2, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants shall have up to, and including, October 10, 2012, to file a Response to 6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to, and including, October 16, 2012, to file his Reply. Responses due by 10/10/2012. Replies due by 10/16/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/02/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pujol v. Bank of America Home Loans, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-MLNI
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans, N.A.
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiran Pujol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]