Ziomek et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David P Ziomek and Margaret M Ziomek
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01645
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint as to Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc. Answer due 11/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Stay Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 9, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-109) transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by MDL on 10/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 15, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-109) transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by MDL on 10/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziomek et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Ziomek
Represented By: Melissa Fry Hague
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: James R. Ronca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M Ziomek
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: James R. Ronca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]