Kabo Tool Company et al v. Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd. et al

Defendant: Accuaire Corp., Chih-Hsiang Hsu and Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Chih-Ching Hsien and Kabo Tool Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv01859
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 97 Renewed Emeregency Motion for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING re 102 Order. Hearing set for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation to Stay this matter for 30 days after the Federal Circuit issues an appellate order ruling on Kabo's appeal in the JSP Action. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 15, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 32 Motion for Protective Order and 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 20, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 31, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 61 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 6, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 40 Motion for Leave to File to File Surreply to Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' 42 Motion to Seal 41 Declaration is Granted. Defendants' 54 Motion to Reconsider or Amend [53 ] Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is Denied. Defendants' 59 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is Granted. The Clerk of Court shall strike 58 Entry of Default. Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal is Denied. Defendant's 72 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 67 Order is Denied. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 14, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties submit an amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 3/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 20, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 79 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 7, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 7, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabo Tool Company et al v. Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accuaire Corp.
Represented By: Jack C. Juan
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chih-Hsiang Hsu
Represented By: Jack C. Juan
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porauto Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Jack C. Juan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chih-Ching Hsien
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Represented By: Jas S Dhillon
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Howard Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabo Tool Company
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Represented By: Jas S Dhillon
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Howard Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]