Hypertherm, Inc. v. Profile Cutting Technologies Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Hypertherm, Inc.
Defendant: Profile Cutting Technologies Ltd., WestingCut Electric (Shanghai) Inc., WestingCut Industrial Technology (Anhui) Inc. and WestingCut Industrial Technology (Shanghai) Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01952
Filed: November 13, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER Adopting and Accepting 21 Report and Recommendation. Granting the permanent injunction and attorneys fees. Granting 16 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 13, 2014 23 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of Hypertherm, Inc. and against WestingCut Electric (Shanghai) Inc., WestingCut Industrial Technology (Anhui) Inc., and WestingCut Industrial Technology (Shanghai) Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 14, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Seal DECLARATION of Joseph A. Capraro as to 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 31, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 29 Report and Recommendation. Granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is hereby awarded $38,821.76 against defendants WestingCut Industrial Technology (Anhui) Inc., WestingCut Electric (Shanghai) Inc., and WestingCut Industrial Technology (Shanghai) Inc., jointly and severally. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hypertherm, Inc. v. Profile Cutting Technologies Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypertherm, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Capraro, Jr.
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: W. West Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profile Cutting Technologies Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestingCut Electric (Shanghai) Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestingCut Industrial Technology (Anhui) Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestingCut Industrial Technology (Shanghai) Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]