Monte Greenawalt Revocable Trust et al v. Brown et al

Defendant: W. Kendall Brown and Brown & Associates
Plaintiff: Ruth Greenawalt and Monte Greenawalt Revocable Trust
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01983
Filed: November 15, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER that Brown is granted 21 days from the date of entry of this order to cure his defective Petition for Removal. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 22, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER that 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Motion for Leave to Amend is GRANTED in accordance with the restrictions noted in the Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 26, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Nicholas J. Santoro is substituted in place and stead of Joseph P Garin for W. Kendall Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 39 replaced on 11/26/2013) (MMM).
December 19, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER that 37 and 41 Motions for Protective Order are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2014 55 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 54 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monte Greenawalt Revocable Trust et al v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kendall Brown
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Associates
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Greenawalt
Represented By: Neil J. Beller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Greenawalt Revocable Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]