Stockton v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al

Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS and Cook Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stockton
Case Number: 2:2012cv02000
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Request for Judicial Notice re 18 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. A Discovery Conference is set for 3/29/2013 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 2, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in the order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 25, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants file a notice whether they were opposing the MDL consolidation no later than 8/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Stay. This matter is stayed through 10/9/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 45 Motion to Extend Various Deadlines is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 15, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court TEXT ONLY MDL MINUTE ORDER regarding the filing of a transfer order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 17, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 10/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockton v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stockton
Represented By: Cliff W. Marcek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]