Holmes v. Countrywide Home Loans et al

Defendant: ReconTrust Co., NA, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) and Bank of America Home Loan Servicing, LP
Plaintiff: Sharon Holmes
Case Number: 2:2012cv02013
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 22 Motion to Compel is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 1, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 23 Motion to Correct Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 22, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 9 Motion to Dismiss, construed as a motion to remand, is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Motion to Dismiss, construed as a motion to remand, is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaitiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shallenter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Courts 32 Order, the 33 Judgment, and a copy of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Sign Warranty Deed is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Countrywide Home Loans et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Co., NA
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS)
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Holmes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]