Schroeder v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Vicki Schroeder
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02024
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 108 Stipulation to Continue. Deadline for submitting supplemental briefs re 54 Motion continued until 5/26/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Calendar Call res et for 8/18/2015 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Jury Trial reset for 8/25/2015 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 16, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Outlining Standards Applicable to Future Requests for Discovery Extensions Filed in This Case. The standard outlined in 9 are inconsistent with Local Rule 26-4. Accordingly, any previous orders entered in this case inconsistent with the standards enunciated herein, are hereby VACATED to the extent they are inconsistent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 2, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 19 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 11, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 19, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court Discharges the 41 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 49 Motion for Exemption from Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Schroeder
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Sarah M Banda
Represented By: Jerome R. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.