Ferrell Street Trust et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al

Counter Defendant: Ferrell Street Trust, Patricia E. Leon and Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Plaintiff: Ferrell Street Trust and Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Defendant: Patricia E. Leon and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Counter Claimant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02028
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Alessi & Koenig, LLC without prejudice is GRANTED. A&K will be dismissed from this action without prejudice following A&K's deposit of the interpleaded funds. FURTHER ORDERED that A &K's MOTION to Interplead Funds (contained within 20 Response to Motion) is GRANTED. ORDERED that A&K deposit $1,089.73 with the clerk of the court within 14 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
November 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Substitute Attorney Michael F. Bohn as attorney of record for Ferrell Street Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 18, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Matthew David Lamb substituted in place and stead of Attorneys Raya M. Drew and Aaron M. Waite for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 11, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims against defendant/counter-defendant Patricia Leon are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 27, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 38 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying without prejudice 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have 30 days from the entry of a ruling of the Nevada Supreme Court on the question identified above to renew their motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ferrell Street Trust et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ferrell Street Trust
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Patricia E. Leon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrell Street Trust
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Thomas James Bayard
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia E. Leon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Aaron M. Waite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Aaron M. Waite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]