Hannig v. Juarez et al

Defendant: Rafael G Juarez, M.D., Boston Scientific Corp. and Deseret Womens Health Care, LLC
Plaintiff: Velvette Hannig
Case Number: 2:2012cv02058
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER #12. Signed by MDL Panel on 4/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #12 from Southern District of West Virginia as to MDL 2326. Signed by MDL Panel on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 16, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 7 Motion to Remand to State Court, to the Magistrate judge for issuance of a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
January 24, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Declining to Adopt the 24 Report and Recommendation, and to rule on the 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 01/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannig v. Juarez et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael G Juarez, M.D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corp.
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Represented By: Kristen L. Henrichs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deseret Womens Health Care, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvette Hannig
Represented By: Daniel E. Carvalho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]