Gale, et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc., et al

Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, CitiMortgage Inc, Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Morgage, LLC and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Andrea B. Gale
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02065
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER that 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER Denying 46 Motion for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal and Denying 47 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 26, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER Granting 59 Motion for Bond Exoneration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the bond posted by Andrea B. Gale on November 26, 2012 (Receipt No. 2012-144958- CCCLK) in the amount of TWO THOUSAND DOLLARS be released and the monies returned to AND REA B. GALE, forthwith, by the Clerk of the Eighth Judicial District Court for Clark County, Nevada in Case No. A-12-670503-C. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy mailed to Eighth Judicial District Court - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gale, et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Robin P. Wright
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Represented By: Jeff Arlitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Morgage, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Hunter
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M Hunter
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea B. Gale
Represented By: Robert J. Flummerfelt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]