Rodriguez et al v. Pacific Life Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Economic Concepts, Inc., Craig Billings, Kenneth R. Harstein and Pacific Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez, M.D., P.C. and Dr. Benjamin Rodriguez
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02071
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 26 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Benjamin Rodriguez, M.D., P.C., Benjamin Rodriguez. Response due by 3/5/2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 29, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Rescheduling a Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference scheduled for 4/25/13 is VACATED and rescheduled to 7/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 28, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 26 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 30, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice and Final Judgment as to Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 7, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Plaintiffs and Defendant Pacific Life's Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Cancel Settlement Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for July 8, 2013 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay on all deadlines is lifted and the case returns to the normal litigation course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 6, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Defendants Kenneth R. Hartstein and Economic Concepts, Inc. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 7, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Plaintiff Benjamin Rodriguez's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: certified copy of docket sheet and order to 8th Judicial District Court - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Pacific Life Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economic Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J D'Anniballe, Jr.
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Billings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Harstein
Represented By: Robert J D'Anniballe, Jr.
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Life Insurance Company
Represented By: JP Hendricks
Represented By: Joshua P. Henry
Represented By: Kenna L Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Anthony L. Vitullo
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Lance Lee Livingston
Represented By: Jonathan David Azano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Benjamin Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan David Azano
Represented By: Lance Lee Livingston
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Anthony L. Vitullo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]