Carrillo v. Gillespie et al

Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, County of Clark and Douglas Gillespie
Plaintiff: Gilberto Carrillo
Case Number: 2:2012cv02165
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 80 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 30, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 79 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Additional Copywork and 94 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Legal Supplies Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 2, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 122 Belated Motion to Extend Discovery. Plaintiff's 128 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion to Extend Discovery is Denied. Defendants' 127 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline is Granted and the following extensions apply: Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2014. All else as stated in the 56 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order remains unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 30, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 153 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must file a new version of the Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. The Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of that pleading on the Office of the Attorney Genera l of the State of Nevada, c/o Kat Howe. The attorney general shall advise the court within 20 days whether the office can accept service of process for Scott Zavsza. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 05/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 21, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 160 Plaintiff Gilberto Carrillo's Motion to Identify and Issue a Summons on Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Sergeant Scott Zavsza. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court will make a summons of 155 Amended Comp laint, issue summons to Defendant Scott Zavasza (as addressed in this order), deliver same to the US Marshal for service, and send a blank copy of the USM-285 form to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM and plaintiff - EDS)
August 11, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 164 Gilberto Carrillo's Motion to Serve Defendant Scott Zavaza. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court will make a copy of 155 Amended Complaint, issue summons to Defendant Scott Zavaza, deliver to the US Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM and Plaintiff - EDS)
September 23, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 176 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 177 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 6, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 19 Mot ion for Order and Production of Discovery; Denying as moot Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Take Discovery; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Request for Production of Documents; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Limited Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint.The Clerk of Court shall file the Amended Complaint and shall modify the docket to reflect the defendants named in the Amended Complaint. Defendants' [5-6] Motions to Dism iss are denied as moot. The 15 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Defendants Quinn, Christopherson, Razo, Ferry, Daryl, Ritz, and Kim are Dismissed with Prejudice from this action. Defendants th at have been served in this action shall file an answer or respond to the Amended Complaint within 45 days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this Order and the Amended Complaint on the Office of the At torney General of the State of Nevada, c/o Kat Howe. The Attorney General shall advise the court within 20 days of the date of entry of this order whether they can accept service of process for the named defendants. If the Attorney General does not accept service of process of any named defendants, then Plaintiff must file a motion identifying the unserved defendants. Such defendants shall file an answer or respond to the Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of the notice of acceptance of service. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 29, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 63 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from this order to file his response. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo v. Gillespie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Carrillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]