Epperson v. Henderson Detention Center et al

Defendant: Medical Department, Henderson Detention Center and Dr. Saaveda
Plaintiff: Clifford Epperson
Case Number: 2:2012cv02173
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this order to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or submit a properly completed pauper application with all required, and new, financial attachments. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order, and of the five-page pauper application (dkt. no. 1), by mail to Corrections Superintendent Lauer. FURTHER ORDERED that all exhibits filed at the time of e ntry of this order, including Docket Nos. 3, 5, 6 and 8, shall be STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file no more exhibits in this action other than exhibits that are filed either in support of a motion or in response to a Court order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; ifp form w/instructions to plaintiff - MMM)
March 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file the complaint and that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim, subject to leave to amend within thirty (30) days of entry of this order to correct the deficiencies in the co mplaint, if possible. FURTHER ORDERED that all motions (dkt. nos. 9, 17-19 & 22-27) are DENIED, for the reasons assigned herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the fugitive filings 12 , 21 , 28 , 29 , 31 & 33 shall be STRICKEN. The Clerk shall send pla intiff a copy of the original complaint that he submitted together with two copies of a § 1983 complaint form and one copy of the instructions for the form. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Notice of Appeal. ORDER certifying to the Court of Appeals that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc COA - MMM)
January 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall seal 3 Exhibit A. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court, to protect Plaintiffs personal identifiers, shall refile Exhibit A with Plaintiffs personal identifiers redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice as moot and that this action shall be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This dismissal shall count as a "strike" for purposes of 28. U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk shall enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epperson v. Henderson Detention Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Detention Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Saaveda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Epperson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]