Cooper et al v. Nick et al

Plaintiff: Frederick A. Cooper and Katherine H. Cooper
Defendant: Trustee, Thomas H. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust One, Trustee, Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust One, Trustee, Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust Two, Thomas H. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust One, Thomas F. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust Two, Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust One, Ellen H. Hardymon, Philipp D. Nick, Trustee, Thomas F. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust Two and Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust Two
Case Number: 2:2013cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 3, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER thtat counsel for the parties shall file a status report by February 13, 2014 advising the Court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 6, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for Defendants shall file a Statement in Removal no later than 2/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Nick et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick A. Cooper
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Elias P. George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine H. Cooper
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Elias P. George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee, Thomas H. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust One
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee, Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust One
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee, Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust Two
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust One
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust Two
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust One
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen H. Hardymon
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philipp D. Nick
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee, Thomas F. Havens Irrevocable Family Trust Two
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne H. Nick Irrevocable Family Trust Two
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]