United States of America v. $50,000.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $50,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00049
Filed: January 10, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 22, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 22, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER for Arrest in rem for Property. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $50,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]