Unite Here Health v. Desert Palace Inc et al

Defendant: Desert Palace Inc, Carl Halvorson and Bistro Central, LV, LLC
Plaintiff: Unite Here Health
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00069
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 33 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Unite Here Health and against Bistro Central, LV, LLC in the amount of $764,207.71. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 25, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER Granting 47 Ex Parte Motion Scheduling Judgment Debtor Examination and Production of Documents. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/7/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 15, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 17, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER Granting 38 Joint Motion to Reopen Case and 54 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This case is consolidated with 2:13-cv-01571-JAD-NJK. Case No. 2:13-cv-00069-GMN-PAL shall serve as the lead case. The pending motion in 2:13-cv-01571-JAD -NJK is Denied without prejudice. Specifically, the Second Motion for Judgment (ECF No. 17) filed by Plaintiffs is Denied with leave to re-file in the lead case 2:13-cv-00069-GMN-PAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Defendants Bistro Central, LV LLC and Carl Halvorson shall have until 5/7/2014 to file a memorandum of points and authorities and any supporting declarati on or affidavit why documents attached to Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Property of Judgment Debtor to be Applied Toward Judgment should remain under seal. Plaintiff's 64 MOTION shall remain under seal until 5/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Unite Here Health v. Desert Palace Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Palace Inc
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Halvorson
Represented By: Tyler Nichols Ure
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bistro Central, LV, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unite Here Health
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]