Painters and Floorcoverers Joint Committee et al v. Bello et al

Defendant: American Contractors Idemnity Company, Michael R Bello, Committed Companies, LLC, Great American Insurance Company, Gwinn Construction (Nevada) Inc., Gwinn Construction, Inc., Hand Construction and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Cross Defendant: Michael R Bello
Plaintiff: Employee Painters' Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Painters Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Painters Industry Promotion Fund, Painters Joint Committee Industry Promotion Fund, Painters Labor Management Cooperation Committee, Painters Organizing Fund, Painters Safety Training Trust, Painters and Floorcoverers Joint Committee and Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and journeyman Training Trust
Cross Claimant: Great American Insurance Company and Hand Construction
Case Number: 2:2013cv00146
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 70 Steve Huntington's Motion to Set Aside 54 Clerk's Entry of Default. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk's entry of default against Steve Huntington (Dkt. #54) is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Huntington shall file an answer not later than February 19, 2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 2, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, 61 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 72 Motion for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 35 Report and Recommendation is Accepted in Full, except for the recommendation of entry of default judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 16 Answer to Complaint is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defa ult is entered against Committed Companies, LLC. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order and Judge Hoffman's Report and Recommendation via certified mail to Committed Companies, LLC's last known address. FURTHER ORDERED that Committed Com panies, LLC shall have 14 days from the date of this Order in which to move to set aside this Order. Such motion shall include any objections it may have to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 10/8/2013 to reflect correct document number (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters and Floorcoverers Joint Committee et al v. Bello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Idemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Committed Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J Richardson
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinn Construction (Nevada) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinn Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hand Construction
Represented By: Christopher J Richardson
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michael R Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Joint Committee Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Labor Management Cooperation Committee
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Organizing Fund
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Safety Training Trust
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Floorcoverers Joint Committee
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J Richardson
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Hand Construction
Represented By: Christopher J Richardson
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]